Standard Process Inc. v. Diaz, Stephen et al
Plaintiff: Standard Process Inc.
Defendant: Stephen Diaz and John Does (1-100)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00373
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Stephen Diaz served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Howe, Stephen)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Effect Service on Defendant by Mail and Email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/10/2020. (jls)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 Declaration of Martha Brewer Motley filed by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. re: #8 Motion for Leave to Effect Service on Defendant by Mail and Email (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Affidavit of Non-Service, #2 Exhibit - Affidavit of Non-Service, #3 Exhibit - Affidavit of Non-Service ) (Howe, Stephen) Modified on 6/10/2020. (lak)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Effect Service on Defendant by Mail and Email by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. Response due 6/16/2020. (Howe, Stephen) Modified on 6/10/2020. (lak)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Effect Service on Defendant by Mail and Email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/2/2020. (arw)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of Martha Brewer Motley filed by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve by Mail and Email re: #5 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service of Tag Process Service, Inc. as to Stephen Diaz in Tempe AZ, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service of Tag Process Service, Inc. as to Steven Diaz in Gilbert AZ) (Howe, Stephen)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Effect Service on Defendant by Mail and Email by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc.. Response due 5/13/2020. (Howe, Stephen)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stephen Diaz. (jls)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls)
April 23, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
April 23, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc.. (Howe, Stephen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26OOQ65T.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 2329616, issued 3/14/2020, held by Standard Process Inc. ; Trademark # 2469448, issued 7/17/2001, held by Standard Process Inc. ; Trademark # 2888707, issued 9/28/2004, held by Standard Process Inc. ; Trademark # 3618534, issued 5/12/2009, held by Standard Process Inc. ; Trademark # 3726215, issued 12/15/2009, held by Standard Process Inc.;, filed by Standard Process Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Stephen Diaz, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Howe, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Process Inc. v. Diaz, Stephen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Process Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Reid Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?