Walkowicz, Lucianne v. American Girl Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lucianne Walkowicz
Defendant: American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc. and American Girl, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00374
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
February 26, 2021 Notice to Counsel: The Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2021 was scheduled in error and is canceled. (rks)
February 25, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, LLC, Mattel Inc.. (Noel, Kristin)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #43 Motion to Admit Aimee Clare Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/16/2021. (lak)
February 12, 2021 Filing 43 Motion to Admit Aimee Clare Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2828867.) by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Clare, Aimee)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #41 Motion to Admit Katherine Sunstrom Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/12/2021. (lak)
February 11, 2021 Filing 41 Motion to Admit Katherine Sunstrom Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2827961.) by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Sunstrom, Katherine) Modified on 2/12/2021: Contact info. (lak)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/11/2021. (jls)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court accepts and enters as its own orders the parties' stipulated protective order (dkt. #37 ) and their stipulated order on the discovery of ESI (dkt. #38 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/11/2020. (jls)
December 10, 2020 Filing 38 Stipulation for Entry of Order on the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, LLC, Mattel Inc.. (Loken, Bryce)
December 10, 2020 Filing 37 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, LLC, Mattel Inc.. (Loken, Bryce)
December 10, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance filed by Bryce Alexander Loken for Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, LLC, Mattel Inc.. (Loken, Bryce)
October 23, 2020 Filing 35 Brief in Reply by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, LLC, Mattel Inc. in Support of #29 Motion to Dismiss (Noel, Kristin)
October 6, 2020 Filing 34 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz re: #29 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mattel Inc., American Girl, LLC, American Girl Brands, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion and Order, Conrad v. Madison Festivals, Inc.) (Mudd, Charles) Modified on 10/7/2020: Added exhibit description. Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff's #32 motion for an extension of his response deadline to defendant's renewed dismissal motion (along with the extension of defendant's reply) is granted in the absence of any objection from defendant. Brief in Opposition due 10/6/2020. Brief in Reply due 10/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/29/2020. (jls)
September 28, 2020 Filing 32 Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange Between Parties' Counsel) (Mudd, Charles)
September 8, 2020 Filing 31 Second Declaration of Mark S. Lee filed by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, LLC, Mattel Inc. in Support re: #29 Motion to Dismiss, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Luciana Book Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2- Catalog Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3- Doll Character Design Copyright Registration, #4 Exhibit 4- Deposit Materials, #5 Exhibit 5- Trademark Application, #6 Exhibit 6- Trademark Application, #7 Exhibit 7- U.S. Registration No. 3,374,432, #8 Exhibit 8- Luciana Copyright Registration, #9 Exhibit 9- Mattel Toys 1986 Catalog Copyright Registration, #10 Exhibit 10- 1986 Catalog Excerpt) (Noel, Kristin) Modified on 9/9/2020. (lak)
September 8, 2020 Filing 30 Brief in Support of #29 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, LLC, Mattel Inc. (Noel, Kristin)
September 8, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION TO DISMISS Amended Complaint by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, LLC, Mattel Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 9/29/2020. Brief in Reply due 10/9/2020. (Noel, Kristin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant American Girl, LLC. (Noel, Kristin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Girl Brands, LLC, Mattel Inc., American Girl, LLC, filed by Lucianne Walkowicz. (Mudd, Charles)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 12/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due 5/18/2021. Settlement Letters due 9/17/2021. Motions in Limine due 10/1/2021. Response to Motion due 10/15/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/1/2021 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/18/2020. (jls)
August 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/14/2020 [:15] (skv)
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Mudd, Charles) Modified on 8/12/2020: Not signed by defendant. (lak)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **When defendants filed their motion to dismiss (dkt. #16 ) on July 13, 2020, the court set its standard 21/10 response/reply briefing cycle. Plaintiff now has asked to double her response time to a total of six weeks; the only cause shown is that plaintiff's attorneys "have been working diligently on their response." (dkt. #23 ). The court will grant plaintiff's request solely because we have not yet set the schedule for this case. Both sides are advised that once the court sets the schedule (which will include a front-end discovery stay to account for the pending dismissal motion), there will not be enough slack to grant extensions of this length on any deadline. Praemonitus praemunitus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/30/2020. (jls)
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 Motion for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mudd, Charles)
July 14, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Katelin Victoria Drass for Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc.. (Drass, Katelin)
July 14, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mattel Inc.. (Noel, Kristin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant American Girl Brands, LLC. (Noel, Kristin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant American Girl, Inc.. (Noel, Kristin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Mark S. Lee filed by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc. re: #16 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Luciana Book Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2- Catalog Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3- Doll Character Design Copyright Registration, #4 Exhibit 4- Deposit Materials, #5 Exhibit 5- Trademark Application and Documents, #6 Exhibit 6- Trademark Application and Documents, #7 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Registration No. 3,374,432, #8 Exhibit 8- Luciana Copyright Registration, #9 Exhibit 9- Mattel Toys 1986 Catalog Copyright Registration, #10 Exhibit 10- 1986 Catalog Excerpt) (Noel, Kristin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 Brief in Support of #16 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc. (Noel, Kristin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 8/3/2020. Brief in Reply due 8/13/2020. (Noel, Kristin)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #14 Motion to Admit Mark Steven Lee Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/13/2020. (lak)
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to Admit Mark Steven Lee Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2712555.) by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Lee, Mark)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Answer due 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/11/2020. (jls)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Johanna M. Wilbert for Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc.. (Wilbert, Johanna)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Suzanne Meddings for Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc.. (Meddings, Lori)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Noel, Kristin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Kristin Graham Noel for Defendants American Girl Brands, LLC, American Girl, Inc., Mattel Inc.. (Noel, Kristin)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Mattel Inc.. Mattel Inc. waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Mudd, Charles)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant American Girl, Inc.. American Girl, Inc. waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Mudd, Charles)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant American Girl Brands, LLC. American Girl Brands, LLC waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Mudd, Charles)
April 23, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
April 23, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Waiver of Service sent to American Girl Brands, LLC on 04/22/2020 by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz. Waiver of Service due 6/22/2020. (Mudd, Charles)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Waiver of Service sent to American Girl, Inc. on 04/22/2020 by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz. Waiver of Service due 6/22/2020. (Mudd, Charles)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Waiver of Service sent to Mattel, Inc. on 04/22/2020 by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz. Waiver of Service due 6/22/2020. (Mudd, Charles)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice by Plaintiff Lucianne Walkowicz re #1 Complaint Civil Action Cover Sheet. (Mudd, Charles)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2665860.), filed by Lucianne Walkowicz. (Mudd, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walkowicz, Lucianne v. American Girl Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Girl Brands, LLC
Represented By: Johanna M. Wilbert
Represented By: Lori Suzanne Meddings
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Bryce Alexander Loken
Represented By: Mark Steven Lee
Represented By: Katelin Victoria Drass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Girl, Inc.
Represented By: Johanna M. Wilbert
Represented By: Lori Suzanne Meddings
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Mark Steven Lee
Represented By: Katelin Victoria Drass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattel Inc.
Represented By: Johanna M. Wilbert
Represented By: Lori Suzanne Meddings
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Bryce Alexander Loken
Represented By: Mark Steven Lee
Represented By: Katelin Victoria Drass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Girl, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Bryce Alexander Loken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucianne Walkowicz
Represented By: Charles Lee Mudd, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Sunstrom
Represented By: Aimee Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?