Duncan, Jason v. United Alloy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Duncan
Defendant: United Alloy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00406
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant United Alloy, Inc.. United Alloy, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Good, Colin)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United Alloy, Inc. (arw)
May 1, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
May 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Alloy, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2670269) filed by Jason Duncan. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Good, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan, Jason v. United Alloy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Duncan
Represented By: Colin B. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Alloy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?