Grant, James v. Schimd, Scott et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Grant
Defendant: Apex Investment Group VII, LLC, Scott Schimd and Apex Property Management
Case Number: 3:2020cv00656
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from plaintiff to Scott Schmid dated 7/27/20. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff has filed a motion for reconsideration of my order dismissing this case because it is not one of the few types of cases that he is permitted to file under the terms of this court's sanctions order. Plaintiff asks the court to "pay for the filing fee and/or complaint fees and costs." Dkt. #4 . Plaintiff's motion is DENIED because I correctly applied the sanctions order to this non-habeas, non-imminent-danger case. If what plaintiff means is that he would like to reconsider the sanctions against him, that motion is DENIED as well. Over the past several years, plaintiff has continued to file lawsuits that are clearly not allowed under the sanctions order unless he pays off the large filing-fee debt that he has accumulated. There's no reason to allow him to pay for new lawsuits while ignoring the debt that he has already run up. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/29/2020. (jef),(ps)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Reconsideration re 2 Text Only Order, by Plaintiff James Edward Grant. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. (nln),(ps)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff is barred from proceeding with his complaint against his landlord because it is not one of the few types of cases that he is permitted to file under the terms of this court's sanctions order. See Grant v. Gill, No. 15-cv-420-jdp, 2016 WL 80676 (W.D. Wis. Jan. 7, 2016). This case is DISMISSED. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment for defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/20/2020. (nln),(ps)
July 17, 2020 Restricted filer / 3-strike screening. (jef),(ps)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Motion for New Complaint / COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Edward Grant. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, state court documents, bank statements, other documents, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant, James v. Schimd, Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Investment Group VII, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Schimd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?