Mader, Lindsay v. Dental Crafters, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lindsay Mader
Defendant: Dental Crafters, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00676
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Dental Crafters, Inc.. Dental Crafters, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Luzi, Scott)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dental Crafters, Inc. (arw)
July 27, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
July 27, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott Stanton Luzi for Plaintiff Lindsay Mader. (Luzi, Scott)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dental Crafters, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2719883) filed by Lindsay Mader. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Lindsay Mader Consent to Join Form) (Luzi, Scott) Modified on 7/24/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mader, Lindsay v. Dental Crafters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Mader
Represented By: Scott Stanton Luzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental Crafters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?