Walker, Jerome v. Leibert et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Walker
Defendant: C.O. Rudie, Nurse Doe, C.O. Leibert and C.O. West
Not Classified By Court: GBCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2020cv00699
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk's Office in response to plaintiff's #8 submission. (nln),(ps)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Request / Motion for Receipt of Institution Check and a Receipt of Money Order and Approve of Both by Plaintiff Jerome Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Disbursement Request) (aom),(ps)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps)
August 24, 2020 Partial Filing fee received: $200.38, receipt number 34690037413. (nln),(ps)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Plaintiff Jerome Walker enclosing payment in the amount of $200.38 for initial partial payment. (nln),(ps)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 39.62 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 08/06/20. (aom),(ps)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jerome Walker (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jerome Walker. (aom),(ps)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff submit $400 filing fee or Motion for IFP w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 8/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/30/20. (aom),(ps)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Jerome Walker. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker, Jerome v. Leibert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Rudie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Leibert
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GBCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?