Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program et al v. Elite Building Controls Incorporated
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Electrical Employees Health & Welfare Plan, National Electrical Benefit Fund, IBEW Local 159 Vacation Fund, Electrical Workers Local 159 Labor-Management Cooperation Communications Fund, IBEW Local 159 Union Dues Fund, Wisconsin Electrical Employees Apprenticeship Coordinating Fund, Electrical Construction Industry Vacation - Holiday Plan, Electrical Prefunding Construction Industry Credit Reimbursement Program, Chris Gulbrandson, Madison Area Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Electrical Workers Local 159 Retirement Plan, Electrical Construction Industry Annuity Plan, Loyal O'Leary, Milwaukee Electric Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Electrical Construction Industry Pension Plan, IBEW-NECA Administrative Maintenance Fund, Robert Rayburn, Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program and Dean Warsh
Defendant: Elite Building Controls Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv00701
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (voc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (O'Brien, Philip) Modified on 9/1/2020: E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. All Defendants. (O'Brien, Philip)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Chris Gulbrandson, Electrical Construction Industry Annuity Plan, Electrical Construction Industry Pension Plan, Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program, Electrical Construction Industry Vacation - Holiday Plan, Electrical Workers Local 159 Labor-Management Cooperation Communications Fund, Electrical Workers Local 159 Retirement Plan, IBEW Local 159 Union Dues Fund, IBEW Local 159 Vacation Fund, IBEW-NECA Administrative Maintenance Fund, Loyal O'Leary, Madison Area Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Fund, Milwaukee Electric Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, National Electrical Benefit Fund, Robert Rayburn, Dean Warsh, Wisconsin Electrical Employees Apprenticeship Coordinating Fund, Wisconsin Electrical Employees Health & Welfare Plan. (O'Brien, Philip)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Elite Building Controls Incorporated. (voc)
July 31, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
July 31, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2723166.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letters of Assent and Inside Wiremen Agreements, #2 Exhibit B - Letters of Assent, Inside Wiremen Agreement and Voice-Data-Video Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Policies, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (O'Brien, Philip) Modified on 7/31/2020: Corrected parties; added parties; deleted addresses; deleted duplicate text. (lak)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 Disregard. Modified on 7/31/2020. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program et al v. Elite Building Controls Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Electrical Employees Health & Welfare Plan
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Electrical Benefit Fund
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 159 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Local 159 Labor-Management Cooperation Communications Fund
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 159 Union Dues Fund
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Electrical Employees Apprenticeship Coordinating Fund
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Construction Industry Vacation - Holiday Plan
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Prefunding Construction Industry Credit Reimbursement Program
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Gulbrandson
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Area Electrical Joint Apprenticeship & Training Fund
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Local 159 Retirement Plan
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Construction Industry Annuity Plan
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loyal O'Leary
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milwaukee Electric Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Construction Industry Pension Plan
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW-NECA Administrative Maintenance Fund
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rayburn
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Construction Industry Prefunding Credit Reimbursement Program
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Warsh
Represented By: Philip R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Building Controls Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?