Campos, William v. Tidquist, Debra et al
Plaintiff: William M Campos
Defendant: Tammy Maassen, Debra Tidquist, Kristine Pralle and Pauline Hulstein
Case Number: 3:2020cv00709
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number 34690037486. (nln),(ps)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On August 10, 2020, I entered an order assessing plaintiff an initial partial filing fee of $366.04 due by August 31, 2020. Dkt. #5 . However, because plaintiff was determined to be indigent and granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is only responsible for paying the $350.00 fee for filing this case. Therefore, plaintiff may have until September 15, 2020 to submit a check or money order in the amount of $350.00. I will instruct the clerk's office to return the check submitted on plaintiff's behalf in the amount of $366.04 to the institution business office along with a copy of this text only order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/25/2020. (nln),(ps)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 366.04 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 08/10/20. (aom),(ps)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff William M Campos (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William M Campos. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Order, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff submit $400 filing fee or Motion for IFP w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/31/20. (aom),(ps)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by William M Campos. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos, William v. Tidquist, Debra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Maassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Tidquist
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Pralle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Hulstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M Campos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?