United States of America v. Bradley, William et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pamela Bradley and William Bradley
Case Number: 3:2020cv00730
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Pamela Bradley. Pamela Bradley waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Darwit, Lauren)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant William Bradley. William Bradley waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Darwit, Lauren)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pamela Bradley, William Bradley. (kwf)
August 7, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
August 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela Bradley, William Bradley. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Darwit, Lauren) Modified on 8/6/2020: Corrected short title. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bradley, William et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lauren Darwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?