Ward, Robert et al v. EyeKor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Ward and Stephen Travers
Defendant: QTI Human Resources, Inc. and EyeKor, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00767
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 18 Discovery Plan (McDonald, Shannon)
October 19, 2020 Filing 17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Giftos, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 Brief in Reply by Defendant EyeKor, Inc. in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss (Giftos, John)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Stephen Travers, Robert Ward re: #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by EyeKor, Inc. (McDonald, Shannon)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiffs Robert Ward and Stephen Travers have filed a notice of voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) to dismiss defendant QTI Human Resources, Inc. from this suit. Dkt. #13 . But Rule 41(a) can be used only to dismiss the entire action; the appropriate vehicle to dismiss a single party is an amended pleading under Rule 15(a). See Taylor v. Brown, 787 F. 3d 851, 857-58 (7th Cir. 2015). So I will construe the filing as a motion to amend the complaint and GRANT it. The court deems plaintiffs' causes of action against QTI to be struck from the complaint, and QTI is dismissed from the case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/29/2020. (arw)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Stephen Travers, Robert Ward (McDonald, Shannon)
September 28, 2020 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant EyeKor, Inc.. (Giftos, John)
September 23, 2020 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 Brief in Support of #10 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant EyeKor, Inc. (Giftos, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant EyeKor, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 10/9/2020. Brief in Reply due 10/19/2020. (Giftos, John)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Defendant QTI Human Resources, Inc. QTI Human Resources, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/15/2020. (arw)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, /Responsive Pleadings by Defendant QTI Human Resources, Inc.. (Gotzler, Michael)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by John Noble Giftos for Defendant EyeKor, Inc.. (Giftos, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Roisin Heather Bell for Defendant EyeKor, Inc.. (Bell, Roisin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant QTI Human Resources, Inc.. (Gotzler, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Gotzler for Defendant QTI Human Resources, Inc.. (Gotzler, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. QTI Human Resources, Inc. served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (McDonald, Shannon)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to EyeKor, Inc. and QTI Human Resources, Inc. (jls)
August 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 21, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2734345.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons-QTI, #4 New case party information sheet) (McDonald, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward, Robert et al v. EyeKor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ward
Represented By: Shannon Daniel McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Travers
Represented By: Shannon Daniel McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QTI Human Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Gotzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EyeKor, Inc.
Represented By: John Noble Giftos
Represented By: Roisin Heather Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?