United States of America v. $19,291.00 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $19,291.00 United States Currency
Interested Party: Fabian Jones and Latia Vance
Case Number: 3:2020cv00792
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant $19,291.00 United States Currency. Brief in Opposition due 10/30/2020. Brief in Reply due 11/9/2020. (Fitzgerald, Lane)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Lane Fitzgerald for Defendant $19,291.00 United States Currency and Interested Parties Fabian Jones and Latia Vance. (Fitzgerald, Lane) Modified on 10/9/2020. (lak)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued. (voc)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/8/2020. (voc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Luehring, Heidi)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Warrant) (Luehring, Heidi)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of John Mahon re #1 Complaint (Luehring, Heidi)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $19,291.00 United States Currency., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luehring, Heidi)
August 27, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
August 27, 2020 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Case related to 20-cr-93-jdp. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $19,291.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,291.00 United States Currency
Represented By: Lane Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heidi Luehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Fabian Jones
Represented By: Lane Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Latia Vance
Represented By: Lane Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?