United States of America v. $17,966.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $17,966.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Anthony Amerson and Aisha Nelson
Not Classified By Court: DCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2020cv00793
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Claimant Aisha Nelson has filed a motion to stay civil forfeiture proceedings until parallel criminal proceedings in Dane County are resolved. Dkt. #12 . The motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/23/2020. (lam),(ps)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Luehring, Heidi),(ps)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff United States of America re: #12 Motion to Stay filed by Aisha Nelson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Luehring, Heidi),(ps)
October 20, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to Claimant Aisha Nelson's #12 Verified Claim and Motion to Stay. Brief in Opposition due 10/30/2020. Brief in Reply due 11/9/2020. (jef),(ps)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 Demand for Trial by Jury by Claimant Aisha Nelson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS for Notice of Appearance, Verified Claim and Motion for Stay, and Jury Demand) (Delyea, Anthony),(ps)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Verified Claim and Motion to Stay by Claimant Aisha Nelson. (Delyea, Anthony),(ps) Modified on 10/20/2020 (jef).
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony C. Delyea for Claimant Aisha Nelson. (Delyea, Anthony),(ps)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 Disregard: refiled as dkts. #11 , #12 , 13]. (jef).
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (nln),(ps)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER by Claimant Anthony Amerson. (jls)
September 23, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Government responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153 and arranging for Mr. Amerson to be on the call. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Verified Claim by Claimant Anthony Amerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jls),(ps)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued. (rks)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/3/2020. (rks)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Luehring, Heidi)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Warrant of Arrest) (Luehring, Heidi)
August 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
August 28, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Jeremy Rademacher re #1 Complaint (Luehring, Heidi)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $17,966.00 in United States Currency., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luehring, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $17,966.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $17,966.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Anthony C. Delyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heidi Luehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Anthony Amerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Aisha Nelson
Represented By: Anthony C. Delyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?