Pyawasit, Mary v. Webbank Corporation
Plaintiff: Mary Pyawasit
Defendant: Webbank Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00833
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jls)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Marco, David)
October 6, 2020 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Webbank Corporation. (Hoffman, Erin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant Webbank Corporation. (Hoffman, Erin)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Webbank Corporation. (jls)
September 10, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
September 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Larry P. Smith for Plaintiff Mary Pyawasit. (Smith, Larry)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit and Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Mary Pyawasit re: #1 Complaint. Civil Cover Sheet, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Marco, David) Modified on 9/10/2020. (lak)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Webbank Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2745062.), filed by Mary Pyawasit. (Marco, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pyawasit, Mary v. Webbank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Pyawasit
Represented By: Larry P. Smith
Represented By: David Michael Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webbank Corporation
Represented By: Erin Leigh Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?