Campbell, Malinda v. Tri State Adjustments Inc.
Plaintiff: Malinda Campbell
Defendant: Tri State Adjustments Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00835
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties have notified the court that they have reached a settlement. Dkt. #4 . As a result, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Any party may move to reopen the case on a showing of good cause. After the settlement is executed, the parties may move to dismiss the case with prejudice if they wish. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/23/2020. (rks)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Malinda Campbell (Lein, Matthew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Tri State Adjustments Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Lein, Matthew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tri State Adjustments Inc. (voc)
September 15, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
September 15, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tri State Adjustments Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2747293.), filed by Malinda Campbell. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Corporate Record, #3 Exhibit Metro Fax letter 12/18/2019, #4 Exhibit Credit Report, #5 Summons) (Lein, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell, Malinda v. Tri State Adjustments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Campbell
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri State Adjustments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?