Fanguy, Elizabeth v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Fanguy
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00857
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (arw)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Elizabeth Fanguy (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Elizabeth Fanguy (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (arw)
September 23, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
September 23, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Elizabeth Fanguy. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2747914) filed by Elizabeth Fanguy, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 9/15/2020: Corrected parties, deleted addresses. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fanguy, Elizabeth v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Fanguy
Represented By: Nathan Edward DeLadurantey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?