Luehring, Kaye v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Kaye Luehring
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv01012
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Megan Hugo for Defendant Andrew Saul. (Hugo, Megan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 11/10/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Duncan, Dana)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office) (voc)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/9/2020. (voc)
November 9, 2020 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
November 9, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (voc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kaye Luehring. (Duncan, Dana)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul., filed by Kaye Luehring. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luehring, Kaye v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Megan Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaye Luehring
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?