Skarlupka, Michael v. The Bureaus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Skarlupka
Defendant: The Bureaus, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01025
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant The Bureaus, Inc.. The Bureaus, Inc. waiver sent on 11/23/2020, answer due 1/22/2021. (Lein, Matthew)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Bureaus, Inc. (rks)
November 19, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
November 19, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Bureaus, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2784472.), filed by Michael Skarlupka. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Corporate Record, #3 Exhibit Metro Fax letter 1/21/2020, #4 Exhibit Credit Report, #5 Summons) (Lein, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skarlupka, Michael v. The Bureaus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bureaus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Skarlupka
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?