Hope Surrogacy, Inc. v. Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC
Plaintiff: Hope Surrogacy, Inc.
Defendant: Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01028
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC. Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Konkel, Laura)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC. (kwf)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Hope Surrogacy, Inc.. (Konkel, Laura)
November 13, 2020 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
November 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2782140.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 5971603, issued 01/28/2020, held by Hope Surrogacy; Trademark # 5971607, issued 01/28/2020, held by Hope Surrogacy, filed by Hope Surrogacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Printouts from TSDR, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Konkel, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hope Surrogacy, Inc. v. Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Surrogacy, Inc.
Represented By: Laura M Konkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?