Wheeler, Amanda v. Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Plaintiff: Amanda Wheeler
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01055
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #9 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Brief in Opposition due 1/28/2021. Brief in Reply due 2/4/2021. (rks/ns)
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration of B. Gauper filed by Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC re: #9 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Card Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Statements, #3 Exhibit 3 - Assignment) (Stromquist, Matthew)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 1/19/2021. (Stromquist, Matthew)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Second). Cavalry SPV I, LLC answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/23/2020. (rks)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (SECOND) by Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stromquist, Matthew)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Amanda Wheeler. (Welcenbach, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Cavalry SPV I, LLC answer due 12/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/24/2020. (rks)
November 23, 2020 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
November 23, 2020 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stromquist, Matthew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Stromquist, Matthew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew O. Stromquist for Defendant Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Stromquist, Matthew)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sawyer County Circuit Court, case number 2020CV000122. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2786215), filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stromquist, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler, Amanda v. Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Wheeler
Represented By: Robert Welcenbach
Represented By: Matthew Curtiss Lein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry SPV I, LLC
Represented By: Matthew O. Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?