Standard Process Inc. v. Fuentes, Pablo et al
Plaintiff: Standard Process Inc.
Defendant: Wellness Enterprises, Pablo Fuentes and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2021cv00033
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Martha Brewer Motley filed by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc. in Support of Motion for Leave to Effect Service on Defendants by Email and Amazon Messaging System re: #7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Howe, Stephen)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Effect Service on Defendants by Email and Amazon Messaging System by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc., Response due 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Disregard., #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Howe, Stephen) Modified on 1/28/2021. (lak)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Defendant Wellness Enterprises as to Wellness Enterprises. (Howe, Stephen)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Defendant Pablo Fuentes as to Pablo Fuentes. (Howe, Stephen)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pablo Fuentes and Wellness Enterprises. (jls)
January 19, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
January 19, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Standard Process Inc.. (Howe, Stephen)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Injunctive, and Other Relief for Violations of 15 U.S.C. 1114; 15 U.S.C. 1125(a); and Related Claims against John Does 1-100, Pablo Fuentes, Wellness Enterprises. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2812501.), filed by Standard Process Inc., (Attachments: #1 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Howe, Stephen) Modified on 1/19/2021: Deleted duplicate text. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Process Inc. v. Fuentes, Pablo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Process Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Reid Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellness Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?