Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC v. Handy, Christopher et al
Plaintiff: Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC
Defendant: Mitchell Koel, Koel's Lawn & Landscape, LLC, Mosquito Shield of WI, LLC, C & K Handy, LLC and Christopher Handy
Case Number: 3:2021cv00043
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Answer due 3/26/2021. The court does not intend to extend this deadline again. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/12/2021. (jls)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Plaintiff Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC. (Friedman, James)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendants' answer due 3/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/25/2021. (jls)
February 24, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Plaintiff Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC. (Friedman, James) Modified on 2/25/2021: Stipulation not signed by counsel for defendants. (lak)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Answers due 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/10/2021. (jls)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC. (Friedman, James) Modified on 2/10/2021 (jls).
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC as to #7 Affidavit of Service, #8 Affidavit of Service, #6 Affidavit of Service, #5 Affidavit of Service, #9 Affidavit of Service. (Friedman, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Koel's Lawn & Landscape, LLC served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Friedman, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Mitchell Koel served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Friedman, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Mosquito Shield of WI, LLC served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Friedman, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. C & K Handy, LLC served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (Friedman, James)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Christopher Handy served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (Friedman, James)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (jls)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to C & K Handy, LLC, Christopher Handy, Mitchell Koel, Koel's Lawn & Landscape, LLC, and Mosquito Shield of WI, LLC. (jls)
January 21, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
January 21, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC. (Friedman, James)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2814020.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 3,286,827, issued 8/28/2007, held by MOSQUITO SQUAD FRANCHISING, LLC ; Trademark # 3,864,119, issued 10/19/2010, held by MOSQUITO SQUAD FRANCHISING, LLC ; Trademark # 3,885,362, issued 12/7/2010, held by MOSQUITO SQUAD FRANCHISING, LLC ; Trademark # 3,889,126, issued 12/14/2010, held by MOSQUITO SQUAD FRANCHISING, LLC ;, filed by Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - July 26, 2020 Demand, #3 Exhibit C - October 29, 2020 Notice, #4 Exhibit D - November 9, 2020 Demand, #5 Exhibit E - November 17, 2020 Demand., #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons - Christopher Handy, #8 Summons - C & K Handy, LLC, #9 Summons - Mosquito Shield of WI, LLC, #10 Summons - Koel's Lawn & Landscape, LLC, #11 Summons - Mitchell Koel, #12 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Friedman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC v. Handy, Christopher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Koel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koel's Lawn & Landscape, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosquito Shield of WI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & K Handy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC
Represented By: James Alan Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?