Peralta, Ramona v. National Presto Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ramona Peralta
Defendant: National Presto Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00072
Filed: January 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' stipulated protective order (Dkt. #9 ) is accepted and entered as the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/23/2021. (voc)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Ramona Peralta. (Attachments: #1 Confidentiality Exhibit A) (Pearson, Kenneth) Modified on 3/22/2021. (lak)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Pearson, Kenneth)
March 10, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 02:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Vaccaro, Robert)
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Schupp, Timothy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert William Vaccaro for Defendant National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Vaccaro, Robert)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy R Schupp for Defendant National Presto Industries, Inc.. (Schupp, Timothy)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant National Presto Industries, Inc.. National Presto Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Schupp, Timothy)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Presto Industries, Inc.(voc)
February 2, 2021 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related to 20-cv-1060-jdp and 21-cv-71-jdp. (voc)
February 2, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
January 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Presto Industries, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2820901.), filed by Ramona Peralta. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pearson, Kenneth) Modified on 2/1/2021: Corrected county. Deleted address of plaintiff. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peralta, Ramona v. National Presto Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Presto Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R Schupp
Represented By: Robert William Vaccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Peralta
Represented By: Kenneth W. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?