Selle, Cindy v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Cindy Selle
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00125
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Michael Scott Mather re: Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Mather, Michael)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily Renee Weber for Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Weber, Emily)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 4/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due 11/15/2021. Settlement Letters due 3/25/2022. Motions in Limine due 4/1/2022. Response to Motion due 4/15/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/2/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/24/2021. (rks)
March 24, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2021 [:10] (cak)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, by Plaintiff Cindy Selle. (Hussey, Ross) Modified on 3/19/2021. (lak)
February 24, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
February 24, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Mather, Michael)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2833602), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Service of Process, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter dated 1-29-21, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pretrial and Scheduling Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mather, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selle, Cindy v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Selle
Represented By: Ross M. Hussey
Represented By: Alexander M Jadin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael Scott Mather
Represented By: Emily Renee Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?