Filighera, Kathleen v. Starnet Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kathleen Filighera doing business as Palo Verde Training Stable LLC and Kathleen Filighera
Defendant: Starnet Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00208
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel Arbitration. Opposition brief due June 4, 2021, reply June 14, 2021. The court does not intend to extend these deadlines again. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/5/2021. (kwf)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Starnet Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Schrimpf, Thomas)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Having failed to file an amended complaint by April 16, 2021, this case will proceed with the sole plaintiff Kathleen Filighera. (See 4/9/12 Order (dkt. 5 ).) The court is satisfied that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Plaintiff is a citizen of Wisconsin (Not. of Removal (dkt. #1 ) para. 8); defendant StarNet Insurance Company is a citizen of Iowa (id. para. 9); and the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000 (id. para. 11). The clerk's office is directed to amend the caption on the docket to remove "doing business as Palo Verde Training Stable LLC" from the description of the plaintiff. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/21/2021. (rks)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Mollie T Kugler re: Defendant Starnet Insurance Company (Kugler, Mollie)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Starnet Insurance Company. (Kugler, Mollie)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Compel and Notice of Motion to Compel Appraisal by Defendant Starnet Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 4/19/2021. (Kugler, Mollie)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Starnet Insurance Company. (Kugler, Mollie)
April 12, 2021 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #7 Motion to Compel and Notice of Motion to Compel Appraisal. Brief in Opposition due 5/3/2021. Brief in Reply due 5/13/2021. (kwf)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court previously issued an order directing the plaintiff to file an amended complaint on or before April 5, 2021, clarifying whether it sought to name Palo Verde Training Stable LLC as a plaintiff. (Dkt. #4 .) The deadline has passed without any word from plaintiff. The court will provide plaintiff another opportunity to clarify. If plaintiff wishes to name Palo Verde Training Stable LLC as a co-plaintiff, it may have until April 16, 2021, to file an amended complaint. In that filing, plaintiff should identify the member or members of the LLC and their respective state or states of citizenship. From this filing, the court will be able to determine whether it has subject matter jurisdiction, and defendant need not file an amended notice of removal. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by that date, or files an amended complaint clarifying that Kathleen Filighera is the only named plaintiff, the court will direct the clerk's office to amend the caption to remove the reference to "doing business as Palo Verde Training Stable LLC," and the court will proceed with this case under its diversity jurisdiction, with the only parties being Kathleen Filighera as plaintiff and Starnet Insurance Company as defendant. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/9/2021. (kwf)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall have until April 5, 2021, to file an amended complaint clarifying whether Palo Verde Training Stable, LLC also is a plaintiff. 2)Assuming plaintiff files an amended complaint clarifying that the LLC also is a plaintiff, then defendant may have until April 12, 2021, to file an amended notice of removal containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship for purposes of determining subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/29/2021. (kwf)
March 29, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
March 29, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas R. Schrimpf for Defendant Starnet Insurance Company. (Schrimpf, Thomas)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mollie T Kugler for Defendant Starnet Insurance Company. (Kugler, Mollie)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wood County Circuit Court, case number 21cv61. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2849909), filed by Starnet Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Circuit Court Summons and Complaint and Exhibits) (Kugler, Mollie) Modified on 3/26/2021. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Filighera, Kathleen v. Starnet Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starnet Insurance Company
Represented By: Mollie T Kugler
Represented By: Thomas R. Schrimpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Filighera doing business as Palo Verde Training Stable LLC
Represented By: Timothy S. Gebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Filighera
Represented By: Timothy S. Gebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?