McCorison, Kitnoki v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Kitnoki McCorison
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00234
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Executed. (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 5/20/2021. (lak)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. Served on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 5/20/2021. (lak)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed. Served on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 5/20/2021. (lak)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (jls)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/8/2021. (jls)
April 8, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
April 8, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (jls)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kitnoki McCorison. (Schultz, Barry)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Alan Schultz for Plaintiff Kitnoki McCorison. (Schultz, Barry)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul., filed by Kitnoki McCorison. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCorison, Kitnoki v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kitnoki McCorison
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?