City of La Crosse v. The 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: City of La Crosse
Defendant: Dynax Corporation, E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company, TYCO Fire Products, LP, Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Clariant Corporation, DOE Defendants 1-20, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, ChemDesign Products Inc., BASF Corporation, duPont de Nemours Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., The Chemours Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Carrier Global Corporation, Chemicals, Inc., Corteva, Inc., Arkema Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Archroma Management LLC, ChemGuard Inc., Amerex Corporation, The Chemours Company FC, LLC and Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00243
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. Signed by John W. Nichols on 4/29/2021. (jls)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal. Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard Inc. Answer due 6/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/19/2021. (jls)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Stone, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (jls)
April 13, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from La Crosse County Circuit Court, case number 2021CV000124, ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2858139), filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stone, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/13/2021. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of La Crosse v. The 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Represented By: Clifton Brinson
Represented By: Addie Ries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Represented By: Brent Dwerlkotte
Represented By: David R. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYCO Fire Products, LP
Represented By: Elizabeth Shannon Stone
Represented By: Trent Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt D. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Represented By: Charles Raynal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Michael Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Blakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: John Wellschlager
Represented By: Matt Holian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: duPont de Nemours Inc.
Represented By: Kat Hacker
Represented By: Maurissa Rushton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Represented By: Ethan R. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Represented By: Clifford J. Zatz
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Laura Offenbacher Aradi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Represented By: Brent Dwerlkotte
Represented By: Maurissa Rushton
Represented By: David R. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan I. Handler
Represented By: Keith H. Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan I. Handler
Represented By: Keith H. Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals, Inc.
Represented By: John Parker
Represented By: Oliver Twaddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Represented By: Kat Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Represented By: Maja Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: Richard Bulger
Represented By: Sarah Rashid
Represented By: Tyler D. Alfermann
Represented By: Daniel Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma Management LLC
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Represented By: Charles Raynal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemGuard Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Shannon Stone
Represented By: Trent Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Represented By: Brent Dwerlkotte
Represented By: Maurissa Rushton
Represented By: David R. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Richard Bulger
Represented By: Sarah Rashid
Represented By: Tyler D. Alfermann
Represented By: Daniel Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of La Crosse
Represented By: Benjamin A. Kaplan
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Andrew W. Croner
Represented By: Paul Napoli
Represented By: Michelle Greene
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?