DatRec, LLC v. Epic Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: DatRec, LLC
Defendant: Epic Systems Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00257
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
June 9, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against DatRec, LLC by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Noel, Kristin) Modified on 6/10/2021. (lak)
June 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. Brief in Opposition due 6/30/2021. Brief in Reply due 7/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Litigation Chart) (Noel, Kristin)
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Returned Executed. Epic Systems Corporation served on 4/20/2021. (Coley, Sherry) Modified on 5/10/2021. (lak)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Epic Systems Corporation answer due 6/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/5/2021. (arw)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Anita Marie Boor for Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Boor, Anita)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Snyder, Martha)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Snyder, Martha)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Martha Jahn Snyder for Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Snyder, Martha)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Kristin Graham Noel for Defendant Epic Systems Corporation. (Noel, Kristin)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff DatRec, LLC. (Coley, Sherry)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit William P. Ramey, III Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/21/2021. (lak)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Tiffany Woelfel for Plaintiff DatRec, LLC. (Woelfel, Tiffany)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to Admit William P Ramey, III Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2862332.) by Plaintiff DatRec, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Ramey, William)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (arw)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Epic Systems Corporation. (arw)
April 19, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
April 19, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Epic Systems Corporation, (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0758-2860798) filed by DatRec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '158 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '309 Patent, #3 Summons Epic Systems Corporation, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Coley, Sherry) Modified on 4/19/2021. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DatRec, LLC v. Epic Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DatRec, LLC
Represented By: Sherry Dawn Coley
Represented By: Tiffany Woelfel
Represented By: William P Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Systems Corporation
Represented By: Martha Jahn Snyder
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Anita Marie Boor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?