School District of Janesville v. Arch Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: School District of Janesville
Defendant: EB Employee Solutions, LLC d/b/a The Difference Card, Arch Insurance Company and EB Employee Solutions, LLC doing business as The Difference Card
Cross Defendant: EB Employee Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00291
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER, CROSSCLAIM of Arch Insurance Company against EB Employee Solutions, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Producer Agreement) (Wolf, Kevin) Modified on 6/25/2021. (lak)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Grossman for Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Grossman, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant EB Employee Solutions, LLC (voc)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 Affidavit of Jenna E. Rousseau filed by Plaintiff School District of Janesville re: #9 Motion for Entry of Default (Rousseau, Jenna)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Entry of Default as to EB Employee Solutions, LLC by Plaintiff School District of Janesville. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Rousseau, Jenna) Modified on 6/17/2021 (rks).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Stipulation (dkt.#7 ) accepted, extension granted Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/11/2021. (voc)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Wolf, Kevin)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin E. Wolf for Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Wolf, Kevin)
June 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Arch Insurance Company answer due 6/25/2021. (voc)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. EB Employee Solutions, LLC served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Rousseau, Jenna)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Arch Insurance Company served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Rousseau, Jenna)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kirk Strang for Plaintiff School District of Janesville. (Strang, Kirk)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Arch Insurance Company, EB Employee Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons EB Employee Solutions, LLC) (voc)
May 3, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
May 3, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2867930.), filed by School District of Janesville. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A - Account Services Agreement, #5 Exhibit B - Summary of Benefits, #6 Exhibit C - Benefit Analysis (Maximum Costs), #7 Exhibit D - Stop Loss Policy, #8 Exhibit E - Amendment to Account Services Agreement) (Rousseau, Jenna) Modified on 4/30/2021. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: School District of Janesville v. Arch Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EB Employee Solutions, LLC d/b/a The Difference Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Grossman
Represented By: Kevin E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EB Employee Solutions, LLC doing business as The Difference Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: School District of Janesville
Represented By: Jenna E. Rousseau
Represented By: Kirk Strang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: EB Employee Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?