Ellerman, Bradley v. Whitley, John et al
Plaintiff: Bradley T. Ellerman and Bradley Thomas Ellerman
Defendant: Division Director Cindy Lass, HR Specialist Muriel Hutson and John E. Whitley
Case Number: 3:2021cv00324
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff Bradley T. Ellerman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Summonses and copies of the complaint forwarded to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Muriel Hutson, #2 Summons - Cindy Lass, #3 Summons - U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons - Attorney General of the United States, #5 Clerk's Cover Letter, #6 Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(i)) (kmd),(ps)
May 26, 2021 Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 34690038880. (jef),(ps)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. (Filing Fee due 6/3/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/13/2021. (kmd),(ps) Modified docket text. (jef).
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bradley T. Ellerman. (kmd),(ps)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bradley T. Ellerman. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 EEOC Appeal Decision , #2 Envelope) (kmd),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellerman, Bradley v. Whitley, John et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley T. Ellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Thomas Ellerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Director Cindy Lass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR Specialist Muriel Hutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Whitley
Represented By: Timothy Craig Samuelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?