Larson Christianson, Kayla v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Kayla M. Larson Christianson
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00328
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Disregard. Modified on 7/15/2021. (lak)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Andrew M. Saul served on 6/21/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Schultz, Barry)
July 12, 2021 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (kwf)
May 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kwf)
May 19, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (kwf)
May 19, 2021 Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Barry Alan Schultz for Plaintiff Kayla M. Larson Christianson. (Schultz, Barry)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2877200.), filed by Kayla M. Larson Christianson. (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Schultz, Barry) Modified on 5/18/2021: Date. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson Christianson, Kayla v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla M. Larson Christianson
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?