Gatson, Rodney v. Jess, Cathy et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Gatson
Defendant: Candace Whitman, Cathy A. Jess and Randall R. Hepp
Case Number: 3:2021cv00334
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. (jef),(ps)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that plaintiff Rodney Gatson's complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a federal claim upon which relief may be granted. A strike shall be recorded in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment for defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/8/2021. (jef),(ps)
June 1, 2021 Filing fee received: $350.00, receipt number 34690038899. (kmd),(ps)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 52.96 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 05/18/2021. (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Rodney Gatson (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 Declaration of Rodney Gatson filed by Plaintiff Rodney Gatson re: #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Envelope and Letter from Pinix and Soukup LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Draft of Letter Sent to Attorneys, #3 Exhibit C - List of Attorney Letters were sent to) (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Rodney Gatson. (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for an Appointment of an Expert by Plaintiff Rodney Gatson. (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rodney Gatson. (aom),(ps)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Rodney Gatson. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Whitman dated 10/09/18, #3 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum to Hepp and Whitman, #4 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Cathy Jess dated 10/10/18, #5 Exhibit 4 - Letter from DAI Admin Percy dated 10/10/18, #6 Exhibit 5 - Inmate Complaint, #7 Exhibit 6 - ICE Receipt Complaint No. FLC-2018-21866, #8 Exhibit 7 - ICE Report Complaint No. FLC-2018-21866, #9 Exhibit 8 - Reviewing Authority's Decision, #10 Exhibit 9 - Inmate Complaint Appeal, #11 Exhibit 10 - CCE Receipt Complaint No. FLC-2018-21866, #12 Exhibit 11 - CCE Report Complaint No. FLC-2018-21866, #13 Exhibit 12 - Office of Secretary Decision Complaint No. FLC-2018-21866, #14 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatson, Rodney v. Jess, Cathy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candace Whitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy A. Jess
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall R. Hepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Gatson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?