Coetzee, Courtney v. Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC
Plaintiff: Courtney Coetzee
Defendant: Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00337
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Zoeller, David)
July 12, 2021 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
June 25, 2021 Set Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. #Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached. (arw)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC. (Levanetz, Chad)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC. (Levanetz, Chad)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Chad R. Levanetz for Defendant Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC. (Levanetz, Chad)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Zoeller, David)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC. (arw)
May 27, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw)
May 27, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw)
May 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0758-2878469) filed by Courtney Coetzee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form (Coetzee), #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Zoeller, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coetzee, Courtney v. Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Lake Health Care Center LLC
Represented By: Chad R. Levanetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Coetzee
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Madden
Represented By: David C. Zoeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?