Machicote, Anthony v. Hoffman, Karl et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Jason Machicote
Defendant: Correctional Officer John Doe, Physician John Doe, Dr. Karl Hoffman, Roslyn Huneke and Nurse Marilynn Martin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00350
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff Anthony Machiote is GRANTED leave to proceed on his claims: a. Eighth Amendment claims that defendants Dr. Karl Hoffman, Marilynn Martin, Roslyn Huneke and John Doe 1 failed to provide him his prescribed pain medication following his appendectomy and that defendant John Doe 2 failed to contact a medical provider when he was in severe pain. b. First Amendment retaliation claims that defendants Martin, John Doe 1, Huneke and Hoffman denied him his prescription pain medication because he had previously filed complaints against them or their colleagues. Plaintiff is DENIED leave to proceed on any other claim. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/15/2021. (kmd),(ps)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/15/2021. (lam),(ps)
June 15, 2021 Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) Screening. (lam),(ps)
June 14, 2021 Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 34690038972. (lam),(ps)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff submit $402 filing fee or Motion for IFP w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 05/24/2021. (aom),(ps)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Anthony Jason Machicote. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
May 24, 2021 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Case no longer assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machicote, Anthony v. Hoffman, Karl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jason Machicote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Karl Hoffman
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roslyn Huneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Marilynn Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?