Jones, Priscilla et al v. Sun Prairie Area School District
Plaintiff: Priscilla Jones, David Ervins and Dazarrea Ervins
Defendant: Sun Prairie Area School District
Case Number: 3:2021cv00366
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 Brief in Reply by Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District in Support of #9 Motion to Sever (Tierney, Danielle)
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs David Ervins, Dazarrea Ervins, Priscilla Jones re: #9 Motion to Sever filed by Sun Prairie Area School District (Lamarr, B'Ivory)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 7/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due 3/4/2022. Settlement Letters due 6/27/2022. Motions in Limine due 7/8/2022. Response to Motion due 7/22/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/8/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/1/2021. (rks)
June 30, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/30/2021 [:10] (cak)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 Declaration of Brad Saron filed by Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District re: #9 Motion to Sever (Tierney, Danielle)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 Brief in Support of #9 Motion to Sever by Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District (Tierney, Danielle)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to Sever by Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District. Response due 7/6/2021. (Tierney, Danielle)
June 28, 2021 Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to #9 Motion to Sever. Brief in Opposition due 7/19/2021. Brief in Reply due 7/29/2021. (rks/slc)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Tierney, Danielle)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District as to #5 Exhibit. (Tierney, Danielle) Modified on 6/3/2021. (lak)
June 3, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District as to #1 Notice of Removal,. (Tierney, Danielle)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sun Prairie Area School District (Tierney, Danielle)
June 3, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
June 3, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
June 3, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District. (Tierney, Danielle)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER by Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District. (Tierney, Danielle)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Marie Lubinsky for Defendant Sun Prairie Area School District. (Lubinsky, Lori)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 2021CV000968. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2884811), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tierney, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones, Priscilla et al v. Sun Prairie Area School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Jones
Represented By: B'Ivory Lamarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ervins
Represented By: B'Ivory Lamarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dazarrea Ervins
Represented By: B'Ivory Lamarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Prairie Area School District
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Represented By: Danielle B Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?