Robinson III, Kenneth v. Syed et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Robinson III
Defendant: Deputy Jhon Doe #1, Nurse Cliff, Deputy Jhon Doe #4, Dr. Syed, Nurse Mandy, Deputy Jame Doe #1, Jame Doe #1, Deputy Jhon Doe #2, Deputy Jhon Doe #3, Burse Bobbie, Deputy John Doe #1, Deputy John Doe #2, Deputy John Doe #3, Deputy John Doe #4, Nurse Jane Doe #1, Nurse Bobbie, Deputy Jane Doe #1 and Kalvin Barrett
Case Number: 3:2021cv00386
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Kalvin Barrett, Dr. Syed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Sheriff Kalvin Barrett). Materials forwarded to U.S. Marshals for service. (lam),(ps)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Current Dane County Sheriff Kalvin Barrett substituted for David Mahoney as the nominal defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/23/2021. (lam),(ps)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Because the only properly named defendant in this case, Dr. Salam Syed, is employed by a contract agency, the Dane County Sheriff, David Mahoney, is added as a nominal defendant solely for the purposes of accomplishing service and conducting discovery regarding the identities of the Doe defendants. The clerk of court is directed to forward copies of plaintiff's complaint, completed summons forms, the dkt. #8 order and this order to the U.S. Marshal for service on defendant Mahoney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/23/2021. (jef),(ps)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 Disregard. Wrong case.
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Deputy John Doe #1, Deputy John Doe #2, Nurse Jane Doe #1, and Dr. Salem Syed. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Deputy Jane Doe #1, Deputy John Doe #3, Deputy John Doe #4, Mandy (Well Path), Bobbie (Well Path - (Head Nurse)) and Cliff (Well Path). Service to be made by USMS. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/14/2021. (lam),(ps)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 Claims of Relief filed by Plaintiff Kenneth W. Robinson III. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (kmd),(ps)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Copy of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kenneth W. Robinson III. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 Warden PLRA Letter. (lam),(ps)
June 22, 2021 Partial Filing fee received: $10.00, receipt number 34690039006. (lam),(ps)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 10.00 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/09/2021. (aom),(ps)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Kenneth W. Robinson III (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kenneth W. Robinson III. (aom),(ps)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Kenneth W. Robinson III. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson III, Kenneth v. Syed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jhon Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Cliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jhon Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Syed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Mandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jame Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jame Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jhon Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jhon Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burse Bobbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Bobbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalvin Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Robinson III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?