Collins, Rosemary v. Energizer Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosemary Collins
Defendant: Energizer Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00390
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Energizer Holdings, Inc.. Energizer Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Huber, Beth)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Energizer Holdings, Inc., filed by Rosemary Collins. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof) (Huber, Beth)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Energizer Holdings, Inc. (kwf)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Energizer Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2889235.), filed by Rosemary Collins. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet and New Case Party Information form) (Huber, Beth) Modified on 6/11/2021: Deleted addresses of both parties. Deleted duplicate party Energizer Holdings, Inc. from database. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins, Rosemary v. Energizer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Collins
Represented By: Beth Ann Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energizer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?