Clark, Rachelle et al v. The Sherwin-Williams Company et al
Plaintiff: United Healthcare and Rachelle Clark
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. and The Sherwin-Williams Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00395
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 Disregard. To be refiled. AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rachelle Clark, filed by Rachelle Clark. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter Request for Leave to Amend Complaint) (Benson, Paul) Modified on 8/12/2021. (lak)
August 5, 2021 Filing 17 Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Plaintiff Rachelle Clark (Benson, Paul)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Plaintiff United Healthcare, Cross Claimant United Healthcare (Paider, Katelyn)
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Report by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company (Emmerich, Ann)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 8/23/2021. Dispositive Motions due 4/22/2022. Settlement Letters due 9/9/2022. Motions in Limine due 9/16/2022. Response to Motion due 9/30/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 10/24/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/27/2021. (rks)
July 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/22/2021 [:10] (cak)
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff United Healthcare, Cross Claimant United Healthcare. (Paider, Katelyn)
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Claim and Cross-Claim by Defendants Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Emmerich, Ann) Modified on 7/19/2021 (rks).
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Discovery Plan (Emmerich, Ann)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Katelyn Evalise Paider for Plaintiff United Healthcare, Cross Claimant United Healthcare. (Paider, Katelyn)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 Claim and Cross-Claim by Plaintiff United Healthcare. (Rexroat, Christopher)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher Rexroat for Plaintiff United Healthcare. (Rexroat, Christopher)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #4 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, extension granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/24/2021. (rks)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Emmerich, Ann)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Emmerich, Ann)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer by Defendants Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Emmerich, Ann)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann Emmerich for Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Emmerich, Ann)
June 24, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks)
June 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
June 17, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Emmerich, Ann)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rock County Circuit Court, case number 21CV298. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2891388), filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings), #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Emmerich, Ann) Modified on 6/17/2021. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark, Rachelle et al v. The Sherwin-Williams Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare
Represented By: Paul Michiael Benson
Represented By: Christopher Rexroat
Represented By: Katelyn Evalise Paider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Clark
Represented By: Paul Michiael Benson
Represented By: Paul Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ann Emmerich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Ann Emmerich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?