Williams, Roosevelt v. Larson, Andrew et al
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Williams
Defendant: Andrew J. Larson, Jos N. Falks, Randall R. Hepp and Joe L. Falke
Not Classified By Court: WCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2021cv00396
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 16 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Joe L. Falke, Randall R. Hepp, Andrew J. Larson. (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps)
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin L Grzebielski for Defendants Joe L. Falke, Randall R. Hepp, Andrew J. Larson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Joe L. Falke, Andrew J. Larson, and Randall R. Hepp. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/15/2021. (lam),(ps)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps)
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiff regarding filing fees. (Attachments: #1 Copy of #11 Letter NEF) (aom),(ps)
July 7, 2021 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 1.53, receipt number 34690039124. (jef),(ps)
June 21, 2021 Filing 11 Letter regarding release account funds by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams. (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.53 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/16/2021. (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Roosevelt Williams filed by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Letter to DOJ and Envelope, #3 Complaint No. WCI-2021-5599 Documents, #4 Complaint No. WCI-2021-5043 Documents, #5 Incident Report, #6 Public Records Request Response, #7 Exhibit 100.01 - Waupun Memorial Hospital medical tag, #8 Exhibit 100.02 - Letter from Health Service Staff Jeanpierre dated 3-30-21 regarding rabies, #9 Exhibit 100.03 - Letter from Security Director Falke dated 4-7-21 regarding animal bite, #10 Exhibit 100.04 - Health Service Request, #11 Exhibit 100.05-06 - Interview Information Request, #12 Exhibit 100.07-08 - Interview Information Request, #13 Exhibit 100.09-10 - Interview Information Request, #14 Exhibit 100.11-12 - Interview Information Request, #15 Exhibit 100.13-14 - Interview Information Request, #16 Exhibit 100.15-16 - Interview Information Request, #17 Exhibit 100.17-18 - Interview Information Request, #18 Exhibit 100.19 - Health Service Request, #19 Exhibit 100.20 - Health Service Request, #20 Exhibit 100.21 - Health Service Request, #21 Exhibit 100.22 - Psychological Service Request, #22 Exhibit 100.23 - Health Service Request, #23 Exhibit 100.24-26 - Rabies Vaccine Suspension for Injection) (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 Declaration of Isaac Jackson filed by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams. (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 Declaration of Francisco Torriss filed by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams. (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 Declaration of Jevonte Flippin filed by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams. (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Declaration of Michael Nash filed by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams. (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 Declaration of Troy C. Johnson filed by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams. (aom),(ps)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roosevelt Williams. (Attachment(s): #1 Authorization to Withhold Money from Trust Account) (aom),(ps) (
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Roosevelt Williams. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Certificate as to three or more dismissals) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Roosevelt v. Larson, Andrew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Larson
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jos N. Falks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall R. Hepp
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe L. Falke
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?