Paluch, Brian v. Benzel, Jason et al
Plaintiff: Brian Paluch
Defendant: Jason Benzel, Brandi Enriquez and Wisconsin Department Of Corrections
Not Classified By Court: DCI Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2021cv00436
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Civil case terminated for plaintiff's failure to submit a Trust Fund Account Statement. No fee is owed for filing this case. (jef),(ps)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Trust Fund Account Statement due 8/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/20/2021. (kmd),(ps)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from plaintiff regarding Trust Fund Account Statement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmd),(ps)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff to submit a Trust Fund Account Statement by 7/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/06/2021. (aom),(ps)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brian Paluch. (aom),(ps)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Brian Paluch. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 PREA Letter Dated 5-14-19, #3 Exhibit 1 - Employee Statement of Acknowledgement, Employee State of Acknowledgement Regarding Protected Health Information, and Employee Investigation Reports Investigatory Interview (PREA 2001241), #4 Exhibit 2 - Acknowledgement/Agreement Correctional Officer Pre service Training Program Standards, Employment Statement of Acknowledgement, Veterans New Hire Form, Acknowledgement of Receipt, Disability Self-Identification Survey, Employee Health Services New Employee Notification, Chapter 302 Codes, and DCI Use of Force form (PREA 2001241), #5 Exhibit 3 - Persona Address Book Entry (PREA 2001241), #6 Exhibit 4 - Employee Investigation Reports Investigatory Interview and other document(PREA 2001241), #7 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Warden Pollard dated 03/21/19 (PREA 2001241), #8 Exhibit 6 - Name, Address, and Telephone Document (PREA 2001241), #9 Exhibit 7 - Email chain from Erica Collins to Brian Greff, Employee Investigatory Interview, Employee Investigation Reports, Public Record Request Response, and Telephone Number Detail (PREA 2001241), #10 Exhibit 8 - Enriquez Investigation Phone Call Notes (PREA 2001241), #11 Exhibit 9 - Picture (PREA 2001241), #12 Exhibit 10 - Email Chain from Dan Stiemsma to Joseph Falke dated 03/14/19 (PREA 2001241), #13 Exhibit 11 - Email Chain from Dan Stiemsma to Joseph Falke date 03/25/19 (PREA 2001241), #14 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paluch, Brian v. Benzel, Jason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Paluch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Benzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Enriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department Of Corrections
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DCI Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?