Peterson, Jonathan v. Beier, Colleen et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Morgan Peterson
Defendant: Colleen Beier, LT. Tieg Hoag, Deputy Eli Schroeder, John Doe(s), Jane Doe(s), Cpt. Tonya Niedierkorn, Lt. Joan Koval, Sgt. Tom Halderson, Agent John Accola, Field Supervisor Jeffrey Moessner and Regional Chief Gena Jarr
Case Number: 3:2021cv00443
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 21 Submission regarding exhaustion and violation of rights by Plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Key Exhibits - Lockdown form, inmate request forms, other papers, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 18, 2021 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #15 Order. Mail re-sent to Jonathan Peterson to P.O. Box 67 per notice sticker on envelope. (jef),(ps)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff's second round of motions for injunctive relief and recruitment of counsel, Dkt. 16-18, is DENIED for the same reasons as stated in my August 12, 2021 order, Dkt. #15 . Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/17/2021. (kmd),(ps)
August 16, 2021 Filing 18 Supplement to #17 Letter Requesting Order for Injunctive Relief and Appointment of Counsel, filed by Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-29 - Correspondence, minor violation notices, notice of lockdown rules, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 12, 2021 Filing 17 Letter Requesting Order for Injunctive Relief and Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Disciplinary Due Process Hearing Results, Incident Report, Statement, and Grievance Appeal Decision, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 Brief in Support of #17 Letter Requesting Order for Injunctive Relief and Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson (Attachments: #1 County of Trempealeau Receipts, #2 Letter from Atterbury, Kammer, and Haag Injury Attorneys dated 7-28-21, #3 Packet A - Grievance Response and Statement, #4 Packet B - Grievance Response and Appeal Request, #5 Packet C - Grievance Response, Statement, and Grievance Form, #6 Packet D - Grievance Appeal Request, and Grievance Appeal Decision, #7 Packet E - Grievance Appeal Decision, Appeal Request, and Statement, #8 Packet F - Grievance Appeal Decision and Appeal Request, #9 Envelope) (aom),(ps) Modified on 8/12/2021 (aom).
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson's motion for use of law library and for appointment of counsel, Dkt. #14 , and his motion for appointment of counsel, Dkt. #10 , are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/12/2021. (kmd),(ps)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 Motion (letter format) for Use of Law Library and Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Trempealeau County Jail Inmate Appeal Request, #2 Exhibit - Trempealeau County Jail - Grievance Appeal Decision, #3 Envelope) (kmd),(ps)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from clerk's office in response to dkt. #12 letter from plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Procedures to be Followed on Motions for Injunctive Relief) (jef),(ps)
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from plaintiff regarding initial partial payment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 Letter requesting assistance re: #10 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel filed by Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disciplinary Due Process Hearing Results, Inmate Appeal Request, #2 Exhibit B - Disciplinary Due Process Hearing Results, Inmate Appeal Request, New Horizons release form, other papers, #3 Exhibit C - Actual suicide note, Incident Reports) (jef),(ps)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Letters from attorneys, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting request to defer payment of the initial partial filing fee of $16.56. Initial partial filing fee due 9/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/23/2021. (kmd),(ps)
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Plaintiff Jonathan M. Peterson requesting that payment of his filing fee be deferred until his release on September 13, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts re Attempts at Finding an Attorney, #2 Envelope) (kmd),(ps)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 Letter regarding attempts to obtain counsel and retaliation by Plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Grievance Forms and Response, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps) Modified on 9/1/2021 (jef).
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk's Office regarding Plaintiff dkt. #4 Cover Letter Question. (aom),(ps)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 16.56 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/13/2021. (aom),(ps)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 IPP Calculation, #3 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Disregard. (aom),(ps) Modified on 7/13/2021 (aom).
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (aom),(ps)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Jonathan Morgan Peterson. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Attached Complaint, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson, Jonathan v. Beier, Colleen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Morgan Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Beier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. Tieg Hoag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Eli Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Tonya Niedierkorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Joan Koval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Tom Halderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent John Accola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Supervisor Jeffrey Moessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Chief Gena Jarr
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?