North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund et al v. Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Building Trades United Pension Health Fund, Doug Edwards, Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund and Northcentral States Regional Council of Carpenters
Defendant: Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC
Petitioner: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters
Trustee: jerry shea
Case Number: 3:2021cv00471
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC. Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC waiver sent on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (lak)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC. (Ho, Yingtao)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC. (voc)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** An amended complaint having been filed and the majority of the errors having been corrected, this case is re-opened. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/29/2021. (lak)
July 29, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc)
July 29, 2021 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Related to 20-cv-746-wmc. (voc)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC, filed by North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund, jerry shea, Doug Edwards, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund, Building Trades United Pension Health Fund, Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters, North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Disregard) (Ho, Yingtao) Modified on 7/29/2021: Plaintiff Northcentral States Regional Council of Carpenters added. Petitioner North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters terminated. (lak)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On June 28, 2021, this court entered a text-only order in Case No. 21-cv-416-jdp that stated: "The Previant Law Firm, S.C. is put on notice: if its attorneys, paralegal, legal assistants or others acting on its behalf to continue to file documents that fail to comport with this court's clear requirements, then the court will reject those documents." Dkt. 5. When the Previant Law Firm filed the instant law suit, it made at least five typographical and substantive errors in the docket sheet it submitted. It is not the court's job to correct these errors for serial violators. Therefore, the complaint is REJECTED and this case is CLOSED administratively. The court will re-open this case upon the Previant Law Firm's submission of an error-free docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/27/2021. (lak)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2910535.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Ho, Yingtao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund et al v. Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Benefit Pension Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Health Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Apprenticeship & Journeyman Training Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor Management Cooperative Trust Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters International Training Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Trades United Pension Health Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Edwards
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northcentral States Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: jerry shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: North Central States Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Athletic Flooring, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?