Brueggen, Isaiah et al v. La Crosse County Jail
Plaintiff: Isaiah Brueggen and David Anthony Pearson Jr
Defendant: La Crosse County Jail
Case Number: 3:2021cv00476
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 Warden PLRA Letter as to plaintiff David Anthony Pearson Jr. (jef),(ps)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER as to granting plaintiff David Anthony Pearson Jr.'s #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/30/2021. (jef),(ps)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff David Anthony Pearson Jr. (Attachments: #1 Filing fee orders, 21-cv-381, 21-cv-452, 21-cv-476, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 Warden PLRA Letter as to plaintiff Isaiah Brueggen. (jef),(ps)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Modified on 8/12/2021 (jef).
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Isaiah Brueggen (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter /Inmate General Request Form, #2 IPP Calculation, #3 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Anthony Pearson Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (lam),(ps) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/10/2021) (lam).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Plaintiff David Anthony Pearson Jr ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 3.02 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/29/2021. (aom),(ps)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiffs David Anthony Pearson Jr. (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff Pearson Jr to submit $402 Filing Fee or a Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment w/ a Trust Fund Account Statement by 8/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/28/2021. (aom)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk's Office Regarding unsigned complaint by Plaintiff David Anthony Pearson Jr. (aom)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff Isaiah Brueggen submit a Complete Trust Fund Account Statement by 8/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 07/28/2021. (aom)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Incomplete Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Isaiah Brueggen (aom)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Isaiah Brueggen. (aom)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Isaiah Brueggen. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brueggen, Isaiah et al v. La Crosse County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Brueggen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Anthony Pearson Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Crosse County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?