Pempek, Jennifer v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pempek
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System and University of Wisconsin - Stout
Case Number: 3:2021cv00495
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff requested to promptly file proof of service. (rks)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, et al. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued UW-Stout) (rks)
August 10, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (rks)
August 10, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2917519.), filed by Jennifer Pempek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -October 28, 2020 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Exhibit B - January 11, 2021 EEOC Ltr Rescinding Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C - May 12, 2021 DOJ Notice of Right to Sue, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Board of Regents, #6 Summons UW-Stout) (Good, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pempek, Jennifer v. Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Pempek
Represented By: Colin B. Good
Represented By: Lili Clare Behm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Wisconsin - Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?