East, Otis v. Bjerke, Todd
Plaintiff: Otis McCall East, Jr and Otis McCall East, Jr.
Defendant: Attorney Jeffrey Mochalski and Judge Todd W. Bjerke
Case Number: 3:2021cv00497
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 Request to Compel or Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Otis McCall East, Jr. (aom),(ps)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Gag Order by Plaintiff Otis McCall East, Jr. (jef),(ps)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Suspension of Duties by Plaintiff Otis McCall East, Jr. (jef),(ps)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Counsel or Order to Comply and Assist by Plaintiff Otis McCall East, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 24, 2021 Filing 6 Amendment that defendant Todd W. Bjerke is the individual that violated plaintiff's rights filed by Plaintiff Otis McCall East, Jr. to #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 Warden PLRA Letter. (lam),(ps)
August 24, 2021 Partial Filing fee received: $104.33, receipt number 34690039369. (lam),(ps)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 104.33 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 08/09/2021. (aom),(ps)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Otis McCall East, Jr (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Otis McCall East, Jr. (aom),(ps)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Otis McCall East, Jr. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East, Otis v. Bjerke, Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis McCall East, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis McCall East, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Jeffrey Mochalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Todd W. Bjerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?