Williams, Travis v. Quarrier, Scott et al
Plaintiff: Travis D. Williams
Defendant: Scott O. Quarrier, Jane Doe 1-3 and Technician Jane Doe
Not Classified By Court: WSPF Prison Facility
Case Number: 3:2021cv00502
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 9 Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps)
October 6, 2021 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 0.44, receipt number 34690039596. (jef),(ps)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying plaintiff Travis D. Williams' motions to waive the initial partial filing fees are DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff may have an enlargement of time, to October 14, 2021, to pay the $0.46 initial partial filing fees in each these cases (total $1.38). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/22/2021. (jef),(ps)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 3rd Motion to Waive the Initial Partial Filing Fee and Follow the Precedent by Plaintiff Travis D. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of TFAS for 8/14 - 8/20) (aom),(ps)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Travis D. Williams may have an enlargement of time, to September 14, 2021, to pay the $.46 initial partial filing fees in each of his cases. If, by September 14, 2021, plaintiff fails to make the initial partial payments in each of his cases or shows cause for failure to do so, plaintiff will be held to have withdrawn these actions voluntarily and the cases will be closed without prejudice to plaintiff's filing these cases at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/20/2021. (kmd),(ps)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to Proceed Without A Initial Payment of a Filing Fee by Plaintiff Travis D. Williams. (aom),(ps)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 0.46 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 08/10/2021. (aom),(ps)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Travis D. Williams (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Travis D. Williams. (aom),(ps)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Travis D. Williams. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (aom),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Travis v. Quarrier, Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott O. Quarrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-3
Represented By: Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technician Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: WSPF Prison Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?