Pierson, Dennis v. Saul, Andrew
Plaintiff: Dennis Pierson, II
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00506
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Peter A Oppeneer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Andrew Saul served on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Duncan, Dana)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Materials returned to plaintiff counsel for service. (rks)
September 1, 2021 $402 filing fee paid; receipt number 0758-2929660. (Duncan, Dana)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee due 9/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/12/2021. (rks)
August 12, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
August 12, 2021 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (rks)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dennis Pierson, II. (Duncan, Dana)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Dennis Pierson, II. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Duncan, Dana) Modified on 8/11/2021: Corrected county and cause of action. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson, Dennis v. Saul, Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Pierson, II
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Albert Bianchi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?