Radek, Adam v. Marathon County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Adam s Radek and Adam S. Radek
Defendant: Marathon County Sheriff's Department, Scott Parks, Sandra LaDu, Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company (wmmic), Aspirus Specialists, Inc., Denise F Boehm, Coral L Hufnagel, Denise F. Boehm, Coral Lynn Hufnagel and Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00520
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Coral Lynn Hufnagel. Coral Lynn Hufnagel waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Breen, Patrick),(ps) Modified on 9/17/2021: Waiver sent 9/2/2021. (lak)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick Breen for Defendant Coral Lynn Hufnagel. (Breen, Patrick),(ps)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Sandra LaDu. Sandra LaDu waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Kaiser, Amanda),(ps)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Scott Parks. Scott Parks waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Kaiser, Amanda),(ps)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Amanda Jane Kaiser for Defendants Sandra LaDu, Scott Parks. (Kaiser, Amanda),(ps)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff Adam S. Radek is GRANTED leave to proceed on claims that: (1) defendants Denise Boehm and Coral Lynn Hufnagel, in their individual capacities, violated his constitutional rights by failing to provide him adequate medical care for his gunshot wound and resulting infection; and (2) defendants Sheriff Scott Parks and Jail Administrator Sandra Ladu, in their official capacities, and Aspirus Specialists, Inc., violated his constitutional rights by failing to enact policies, practices, and procedures that ensured adequate medical care to inmates at Marathon County jail. Radek is DENIED leave to proceed on any other claim. Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company is DISMISSED. Plaintiff responsible for service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 9/3/2021. (kmd),(ps)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff Adam S. Radek, by counsel, filed this case on August 18, 2021 and paid the $402 filing fee. Plaintiff, however, is a prisoner in the custody of the Wisconsin Department of Corrections. Because plaintiff is a prisoner, he is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA), which requires the court to screen his complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A and dismiss any portions that are frivolous, malicious, fail to state a claim on which relief may be granted or seeks money damages from a defendant who is immune from such relief. Accordingly, it is ordered that service in this case is stayed pending screening of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/19/2021. (jef),(ps)
August 19, 2021 Judge update in case. Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jef),(ps)
August 19, 2021 PLRA paid prisoner screening. (jef),(ps)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2922126.) Filed by Adam S. Radek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Independent Security Panel Overview/Executive Summary, #2 Exhibit 2 - Agreement Between Aspirus Specialists, Inc. and Marathon County for Health Care for Inmates, #3 Exhibit 3 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 9, #4 Exhibit 4 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 5, #5 Exhibit 5 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 13, #6 Exhibit 6 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 487, #7 Exhibit 7 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 19, #8 Exhibit 8 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 20, #9 Exhibit 9 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 27, #10 Exhibit 10 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 48, #11 Exhibit 11 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 49, #12 Exhibit 12 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record,Page 19, Problem List, Item 15, #13 Exhibit 13 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 1, #14 Exhibit 14 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 8, #15 Exhibit 15 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 318, #16 Exhibit 16 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 336, #17 Exhibit 17 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Scan from 9/21/2015 by R.N. Constance Friedhoff, #18 Exhibit 18 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Wound & Hyperbaric Center Record, Page 1, #19 Exhibit 19 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 188, #20 Exhibit 20 - Aspirus Wausau Hospital Record, Page 198, #21 Exhibit 21 - Aspirus Specialists, Inc. Department of Financial Institutions Certificate, #22 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 Disregard. Modified on 8/18/2021. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radek, Adam v. Marathon County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam s Radek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam S. Radek
Represented By: Julianne Marie Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Parks
Represented By: Amanda Jane Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra LaDu
Represented By: Amanda Jane Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company (wmmic)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspirus Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise F Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral L Hufnagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise F. Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral Lynn Hufnagel
Represented By: Patrick Breen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Municipal Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?