Wesolowski, Sherry v. Barron Area School District
Plaintiff: Sherry Wesolowski
Defendant: Barron Area School District
Case Number: 3:2021cv00585
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Sherry Wesolowski. (Lueder, Michael)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 Disregard. Docketed in error.
October 12, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER by Defendant Barron Area School District. (Lubinsky, Lori)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Lori Marie Lubinsky for Defendant Barron Area School District. (Lubinsky, Lori)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed. Barron Area School District served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Lueder, Michael)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Barron Area School District. (rks)
September 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
September 17, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barron Area School District. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2936948.), filed by Sherry Wesolowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Rights, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Lueder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesolowski, Sherry v. Barron Area School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Wesolowski
Represented By: Michael C. Lueder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barron Area School District
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?