Ryan, Frances v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Frances Ryan
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00592
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/20/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Reynolds, William)
September 20, 2021 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc)
September 20, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2937748.), filed by Frances Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Your Benefit Plan, Associated Physicians, LLP, Partner Physicians, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reynolds, William) Modified on 9/17/2021: Added exhibit description. E-mail sent to counsel. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan, Frances v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Ryan
Represented By: William T. Reynolds, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?