Estate of Violet Gorski v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Estate of Violet Gorski
Defendant: The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00621
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 10 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Arana, Enrique)
October 25, 2021 Telephone Pretrial Conference Rescheduled: Telephone Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 11/30/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
October 25, 2021 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Defenses by Defendant The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Arana, Enrique)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Admit Enrique D. Arana Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Admit Raina Tranice Shipman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/19/2021. (lak)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Admit Raina Tranice Shipman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2951900.) by Defendant The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Shipman, Raina)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Admit Enrique Daniel Arana Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2951831.) by Defendant The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Arana, Enrique)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 10/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/12/2021. (voc)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4 Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Until October 22, 2021 by Defendant The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (La Fleur, Catherine) Modified on 10/12/2021 (voc/slc).
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Defendant The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (La Fleur, Catherine)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (La Fleur, Catherine)
October 4, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks)
October 4, 2021 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County Circuit Court, case number 21CV002067. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0758-2943927), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company Of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Circuit Court Documents, #3 Insurance Policy) (La Fleur, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Violet Gorski v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Violet Gorski
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Catherine A. La Fleur
Represented By: Enrique Daniel Arana
Represented By: Raina Tranice Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?